Medical School:
McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 21 Dec 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery |
02 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Feb 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
02 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 01 Feb 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 21 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE:
02 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 01 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
02 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 01 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University