THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:30:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Education Office
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Education Office
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUSHRA KHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 May, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUSHRA KHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 May, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
16 Nov 2024 to 15 May 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
DATE: 16 Nov 2024 to 15 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 15 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry
DATE: 24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 23 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 15 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 15 May 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018