THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:02:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM MAXIMILIAN ALEXANDER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALEXANDER is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALEXANDER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALEXANDER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALEXANDER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALEXANDER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALEXANDER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM MAXIMILIAN ALEXANDER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALEXANDER is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALEXANDER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALEXANDER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALEXANDER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALEXANDER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALEXANDER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2022 to 07 Nov 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
29 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2020 to 28 Dec 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 07 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 29 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018