THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Diagnostic & Cardiac Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-3001
Fax: 905-417-3006
Address: 250 Marlee Ave
Toronto ON M6B 3H7
Phone: 416-783-0000
Fax: 416-783-0002
Address: 2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M1R 3A6
Phone: 416-757-5051
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Diagnostic & Cardiac Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-3001
Fax: 905-417-3006
Address: 250 Marlee Ave
Toronto ON M6B 3H7
Phone: 416-783-0000
Fax: 416-783-0002
Address: 2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 206
Toronto Ontario M1R 3A6
Phone: 416-757-5051
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018