THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 16:01:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
20 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2019 to 19 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
15 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jul 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 20 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 19 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 15 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018