THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Rd
Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Rd
Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER GRBEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRBEVSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER GRBEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRBEVSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2018