THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2121 Carling Avenue
ActiveCare Carlingwood
Suite 35B
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-6777
Fax: 613-761-7744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2121 Carling Avenue
ActiveCare Carlingwood
Suite 35B
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-6777
Fax: 613-761-7744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDE ALAIN ST AMAND HUBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST AMAND HUBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDE ALAIN ST AMAND HUBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST AMAND HUBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018