THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:59:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.685.8500
Fax: 1(855) 978-1239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.685.8500
Fax: 1(855) 978-1239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHNAM NOWROUZI-KIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWROUZI-KIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHNAM NOWROUZI-KIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWROUZI-KIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018