THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:35:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ng, Vivian (Used Until: 25 Apr 2024)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 404
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197455290
Fax: 5197457649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: Ng, Vivian (Used Until: 25 Apr 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 404
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197455290
Fax: 5197457649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN CORNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN CORNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018