THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1730 Bishop St N
Cambridge ON N1T 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1500
Fax: (519) 800-3732
Address: 89 Dawson Road
Suite 215
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Phone: 519-840-1965
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main Street West
McMaster Downtown Ambulatory Care Clinic/Allergy Clinic
1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 21431
Fax: 905-296-0474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 27 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1730 Bishop St N
Cambridge ON N1T 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1500
Fax: (519) 800-3732
Address: 89 Dawson Road
Suite 215
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Phone: 519-840-1965
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main Street West
McMaster Downtown Ambulatory Care Clinic/Allergy Clinic
1st Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-525-9140
Extension: 21431
Fax: 905-296-0474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 27 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY CHRISTIAN JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY CHRISTIAN JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018