THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:49:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite1200-123 Edward Street
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Temerty Faculty of Medicine
University of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital - Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite1200-123 Edward Street
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Temerty Faculty of Medicine
University of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital - Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NUPUR DOGRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOGRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NUPUR DOGRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOGRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018