THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: McDonald, Sara Michelle (Used Until: 17 Mar 2020)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1028 South Bay Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 6J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON P3A 5H7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

General Information

Former Name: McDonald, Sara Michelle (Used Until: 17 Mar 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1028 South Bay Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 6J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1485 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON P3A 5H7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MICHELLE NYKILCHYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NYKILCHYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MICHELLE NYKILCHYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NYKILCHYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018