THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:26:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
EL - Transfusion Medicine
27 Jul 2020 to 28 Aug 2020
McMaster University
EL - Transfusion Medicine
02 Jul 2020 to 26 Jul 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Hematology
01 Jul 2018 to 25 Jul 2018
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Transfusion Medicine
DATE: 27 Jul 2020 to 28 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Transfusion Medicine
DATE: 02 Jul 2020 to 26 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018