THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:28:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Gastroenterology
19 Oct 2020 to 15 Nov 2020
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
30 Jul 2018 to 26 Aug 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 19 Oct 2020 to 15 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 30 Jul 2018 to 26 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018