THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 520 2100
Extension: 4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 520 2100
Extension: 4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DAVID GRIFFITHS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. GRIFFITHS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GRIFFITHS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GRIFFITHS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GRIFFITHS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GRIFFITHS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DAVID GRIFFITHS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. GRIFFITHS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GRIFFITHS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GRIFFITHS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GRIFFITHS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GRIFFITHS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018