THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:40:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health Services Center Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-1220 Dr Place d'Orléans
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Orléans ON K1C 7K3
Phone: 613-841-5389
Fax: 613-841-5393
Address: N205-801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: 6135625498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health Services Center Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-1220 Dr Place d'Orléans
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Orléans ON K1C 7K3
Phone: 613-841-5389
Fax: 613-841-5393
Address: N205-801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: 6135625498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID AARON ALEXANDER LINCOLN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINCOLN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID AARON ALEXANDER LINCOLN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINCOLN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018