THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:17:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198545232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198545232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DONALD REGAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. REGAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. REGAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REGAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REGAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. REGAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. REGAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DONALD REGAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. REGAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. REGAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REGAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REGAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. REGAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. REGAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
27 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
30 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
04 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 03 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
06 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 06 Jun 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
07 Jun 2022 to 05 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
12 Jan 2022 to 06 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 11 Jan 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
12 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 11 Jan 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 27 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 30 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 29 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 04 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 03 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 06 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 06 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 07 Jun 2022 to 05 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 12 Jan 2022 to 06 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 11 Jan 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 12 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 11 Jan 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018