THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-595 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134225055
Fax: 6134225056

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-595 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134225055
Fax: 6134225056

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA BRIDGET WHALEN-BROWNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHALEN-BROWNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA BRIDGET WHALEN-BROWNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHALEN-BROWNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018