THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:34:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hôtel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-4881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hôtel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-4881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHANIEL SCOTT BUTLER WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHANIEL SCOTT BUTLER WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 08 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018