THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:41:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5858‬
Fax: ‭(519) 751-5570‬
Address: 280 Queenston Road
Rosedale Medical Group
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Address: 6 Albert St
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Emergency Department
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540‬
Fax: (705) 773-4067‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5858‬
Fax: ‭(519) 751-5570‬
Address: 280 Queenston Road
Rosedale Medical Group
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Address: 6 Albert St
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Emergency Department
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540‬
Fax: (705) 773-4067‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONJA BABOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONJA BABOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018