THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:20:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Unit 305
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194737812
Fax: 519-455-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Unit 305
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194737812
Fax: 519-455-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA DANYA HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA DANYA HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018