THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46251
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Emergency Department
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 42285
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 690 Main Street West
Main St. Urgent Care
Urgent Care
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A4
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 46251
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Emergency Department
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 42285
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 690 Main Street West
Main St. Urgent Care
Urgent Care
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A4
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATRIX BÉRCZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BÉRCZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEATRIX BÉRCZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BÉRCZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018