THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:09:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 16 Dec 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
17 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 16 Dec 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
17 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
17 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2020 to 16 Dec 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
17 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2019 to 16 Dec 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 16 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 17 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 16 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 17 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 17 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 16 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 17 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 16 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018