THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
Room E6-117, Victoria Hospital
800 Commisioners Rd E
London ON, N6A 5W9
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Medical Oncology
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
Room E6-117, Victoria Hospital
800 Commisioners Rd E
London ON, N6A 5W9
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Medical Oncology
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM MAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM MAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018