THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Dec 2023
30 Nov 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BELINDA ELISHA may practise internal medicine at The Ottawa Hospital in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ELISHA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ELISHA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ELISHA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2023, and will expire on or before 30 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BELINDA ELISHA may practise internal medicine at The Ottawa Hospital in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ELISHA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ELISHA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ELISHA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2023, and will expire on or before 30 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Nov 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018