THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2865 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1V 8N5
Phone: 6137314660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2865 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1V 8N5
Phone: 6137314660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH BUCHANAN TENNANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENNANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH BUCHANAN TENNANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENNANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018