THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6933
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6933
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Feb 2021
24 Feb 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 25 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 24 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CATHERINE MARY DISKIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DISKIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DISKIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DISKIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DISKIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 February, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 24 February, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CATHERINE MARY DISKIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DISKIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DISKIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DISKIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DISKIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 February, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 24 February, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Feb 2028

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018