THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Department of Pathology
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4700
Extension: 1018
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 16 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Department of Pathology
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4700
Extension: 1018
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 16 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Nov 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 14 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dion Stanley Middleton may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dion Stanley Middleton may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2018