THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2018