Medical School:
Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Apr 2025 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
13 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2018 to 12 Sep 2018 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
13 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2018 to 12 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto