THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Missouri Kansas City School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare – Forest Hill
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amna Hilal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Missouri Kansas City School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare – Forest Hill
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amna Hilal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMNA MARIYA HILAL may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMNA MARIYA HILAL may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Missouri Kansas City School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2018