THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:24:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St W
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Marc Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St W
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Marc Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2018