THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bowmanville Health Centre
Suite 2200
222 King St E
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 697 3607
Fax: 905 697 3465

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bowmanville Health Centre
Suite 2200
222 King St E
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 697 3607
Fax: 905 697 3465

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAURABH PANDALAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDALAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAURABH PANDALAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDALAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018