THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 201-271 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-2112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 205
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 745-9525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 22 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 201-271 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-2112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 205
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 745-9525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 22 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018