THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:02:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELICA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELICA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018