THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 18 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Feb 2022
17 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 02 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 17 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CIARA MARGARET O'BRIEN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Abdominal Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. O'BRIEN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. O'BRIEN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. O'BRIEN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. O'BRIEN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 18 September, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 17 September, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CIARA MARGARET O'BRIEN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, Division of Abdominal Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. O'BRIEN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. O'BRIEN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. O'BRIEN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. O'BRIEN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 18 September, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 17 September, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 17 Sep 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 17 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2018