THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:23:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 601
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 4014
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 601
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 4014
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Mar 2021
31 Jul 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 05 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Hanns Konrad Maria Lochmuller may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
Lochmuller holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Lochmuller
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2018, and expires on July 31,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Lochmuller's academic appointment at the
University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Hanns Konrad Maria Lochmuller may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
Lochmuller holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Lochmuller
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2018, and expires on July 31,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Lochmuller's academic appointment at the
University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2018