THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:55:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Parkway (the)
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133197996
Fax: 6132718998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Parkway (the)
Kanata ON K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6133197996
Fax: 6132718998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIEM LATROUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATROUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIEM LATROUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATROUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018