THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:44:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
24 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2018 to 23 Oct 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 24 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2018 to 23 Oct 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2018