THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay Paediatrics Clinic
Suite 104
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay Paediatrics Clinic
Suite 104
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAZMYN AMETHYST BALFOUR-BOEHM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALFOUR-BOEHM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAZMYN AMETHYST BALFOUR-BOEHM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALFOUR-BOEHM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2018