THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:40:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre - Satellite Health Facility
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBIDAYO OLUYINKA KUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBIDAYO OLUYINKA KUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018