THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:53:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Abbott Rd
Buffalo NY 14220-2095
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 4A3
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Abbott Rd
Buffalo NY 14220-2095
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 4A3
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARUN SINGH BADWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARUN SINGH BADWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2018