THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:55:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital / Oak Valley health
Hematology
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Hematology
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital / Oak Valley health
Hematology
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Hematology
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAFEZ KHALIL ABU FARHANEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU FARHANEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAFEZ KHALIL ABU FARHANEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU FARHANEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018