THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:47:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7077 Bathurst St
Unit 2
Townsgate Medical Clinic & Pharmacy
Thornhill ON L4J 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057093314
Fax: 9057716726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7077 Bathurst St
Unit 2
Townsgate Medical Clinic & Pharmacy
Thornhill ON L4J 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057093314
Fax: 9057716726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIUBOV KRICHEVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRICHEVSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIUBOV KRICHEVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRICHEVSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018