THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:28:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for the Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Endocrinology
and Metabolism
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: 416-813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for the Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Endocrinology
and Metabolism
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: 416-813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA JENNIFER CAN-HAY OEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA JENNIFER CAN-HAY OEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018