THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:56:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
EL - Pediatric Surgery
26 Nov 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
University of Ottawa
EL - Pediatric General Surgery
24 Sep 2018 to 21 Oct 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Surgery
DATE: 26 Nov 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric General Surgery
DATE: 24 Sep 2018 to 21 Oct 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018