THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16-2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16-2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYA IBRAHIM MAHMOUD ABDOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYA IBRAHIM MAHMOUD ABDOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018