THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:30:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Columbia University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Elm Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-6117
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Columbia University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Elm Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-6117
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREA MELINDA KNIGHT may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric rheumatology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDREA MELINDA KNIGHT may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric rheumatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Columbia University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2025