THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:56:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3715 51 St SW
Humana Medical Clinic
Calgary AB T3E 6V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 136-3715 51 St SW
Calgary AB T3E 6V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3715 51 St SW
Humana Medical Clinic
Calgary AB T3E 6V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 136-3715 51 St SW
Calgary AB T3E 6V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eghonghon Mercy Akinsipe may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eghonghon Mercy Akinsipe may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018