THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:41:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2417 Main Street
Suite 102
West Kelowna British Columbia V4T 2H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2502772260
Fax: 647-435-5117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Claire Bourque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2417 Main Street
Suite 102
West Kelowna British Columbia V4T 2H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2502772260
Fax: 647-435-5117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Claire Bourque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE CLAIRE BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE CLAIRE BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018